House | 03/07/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 869. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 21. Nays, 0. Excused, 2. H.J. 534. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 534. | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2025 12:45PM RM 19. | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Subcommittee: Hora, Siegrist and Srinivas. H.J. 420. | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 418. | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |