House | 03/07/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 877. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 21. Nays, 0. Excused, 2. H.J. 534. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 534. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2025 12:00PM RM 304. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2025 12:00PM House Lounge 2 (Cancelled). | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Subcommittee: Hora, Scheetz and Wulf. H.J. 420. | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 419. | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |