House | 03/12/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 941. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 20. Nays, 0. Excused, 1. H.J. 547. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 547. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2025 12:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Subcommittee: Nordman, Barker and Ehlert. H.J. 428. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 425. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |