House | 03/12/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 956. | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 21. Nays, 0. H.J. 550. | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 550. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2025 2:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Subcommittee: Lohse, Lawler and Olson. H.J. 442. | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 440. | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |