House | 03/20/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 969. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 20. Nays, 0. Excused, 3. H.J. 534. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 534. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2025 12:30PM RM 102. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Turek and Wilz, H. H.J. 464. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 462. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |