House | 01/30/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 165. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 14. Nays, 8. Excused, 1. H.J. 143. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 143. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2025 12:30PM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Subcommittee: Henderson, Kniff McCulla and Levin. H.J. 84. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 80. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |