Iowa 2025-2026 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HSB334

Introduced
4/29/25  

Caption

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and technology reinvestment fund, providing for related matters including county payment for district court furnishings, and including effective date provisions.

Impact

A significant aspect of HSB334 is its revision of existing laws related to funding responsibilities, particularly concerning the expenses associated with district court furnishings. Under the bill, effective July 1, 2025, counties will bear full responsibility for furnishing costs tied to the renovation or construction of courtroom facilities. This shift could considerably affect county budgets and may prompt local governments to reconsider how they allocate resources for judicial facilities. Additionally, the bill introduces modifications to how unencumbered or unobligated funds from certain infrastructure-related accounts are handled, ensuring these moneys contribute to ongoing and future projects.

Summary

House Study Bill 334 pertains to appropriations from the Rebuild Iowa Infrastructure Fund (RIIF) and the Technology Reinvestment Fund (TRF), addressing various state projects and initiatives. The bill proposes financial allocations for multiple departments, including administrative services, agriculture, corrections, education, public defense, public safety, and transportation. Through these appropriations, the bill aims to enhance state infrastructure and support economic development projects, indicating a comprehensive approach to managing state resources for essential public services and facilities.

Contention

Notably, the bill's provisions regarding county responsibilities for district court furnishings have sparked some contention. Critics may argue that transferring these costs to local governments could strain county resources, particularly in regions already facing budget limitations. Furthermore, as the bill also appropriates substantial funds for technology improvements and infrastructure projects, discussions on the effectiveness and necessity of these expenditures are likely to arise. Stakeholders in education and public service sectors may express various viewpoints on prioritizing projects and the overall impact of the funding distributions on their respective areas.

Companion Bills

IA SSB1238

Related A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and technology reinvestment fund, providing for related matters including county payment for district court furnishings, establishing the Iowa major events and tourism program and fund, and eliminating the sports tourism marketing program and fund, and including effective date provisions.

Similar Bills

IA HF2691

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and technology reinvestment fund, providing for related matters including renewable fuel infrastructure incentives, and including effective date provisions. Effective date: 05/09/2024, 07/01/2024.

IA SSB1218

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and technology reinvestment fund, and including effective date provisions.

IA SF577

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and technology reinvestment fund, establishing a destination Iowa fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1221.) Effective date: 06/01/2023, 07/01/2023.

IA SSB3202

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and technology reinvestment fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2438.)

IA SF2438

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and technology reinvestment fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3202.)

IA HSB253

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and technology reinvestment fund, establishing a destination Iowa fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 730.)

IA HF730

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and technology reinvestment fund, establishing a destination Iowa fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly HSB 253.)

IA SF558

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations involving state government entities associated with agriculture, natural resources, and environmental protection. (Formerly SSB 1210.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.