Iowa 2025-2026 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HSB337

Introduced
4/29/25  

Caption

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the education system, including the funding and operation of the department for the blind, department of education, and state board of regents, and including contingent effective date provisions.

Impact

If enacted, HSB337 will positively impact the funding landscape of Iowa's education system. It includes provisions for a new court reporter equipment grant program, which aims to support students enrolled in court reporter training programs. By providing financial incentives and resources, the bill seeks to strengthen the skill sets available to those entering the legal transcription field. Moreover, appropriations for at-risk children are capped to maintain budgetary specificity while addressing essential services provided to vulnerable youth, reflecting a balance between fiscal responsibility and educational support.

Summary

House Study Bill 337 is a legislative proposal focused on appropriations concerning the education system in Iowa. The bill outlines various funding allocations for the fiscal year 2025-2026, specifically targeting the operations of the Department for the Blind, the Department of Education, and the State Board of Regents. The intent of the bill is to ensure sustained financial support for education-related programs, thereby promoting educational access and quality across the state. This includes funding for general administration, as well as specific programs aimed at enhancing educational outcomes for vulnerable populations, such as at-risk children.

Contention

Despite the broad support for educational funding, there may be contention regarding how the funding for at-risk children is managed. The bill limits the appropriations available for such programs, raising concerns among advocates who believe that careful funding is crucial for maintaining quality educational supports. Additionally, there may be discussions surrounding the new court reporter grant program, particularly its eligibility criteria and the effectiveness of such incentives in areas where demand for court reporting may fluctuate significantly. Stakeholders will likely engage in dialogue on these points as part of the legislative process.

Companion Bills

IA SSB1231

Related A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the education system, including the funding and operation of the department for the blind, department of education, and state board of regents, and including contingent effective date provisions.

Similar Bills

IA SF560

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the education system, including the funding and operation of the department for the blind, the department of education, and the state board of regents; requiring the state board of regents to conduct a study and prepare a report related to diversity, equity, and inclusion programs and efforts; providing for responsibilities of the workforce development board; establishing the Iowa workforce grant and incentive program; requiring the department of education to convene a task force to study issues related to programs for at-risk students and dropout prevention programs; modifying provisions related to the future ready Iowa skilled workforce grant program, the all Iowa opportunity scholarship program, the education savings account program, the gap tuition assistance program, the Iowa educational services for the blind and visually impaired program, career and technical education programs, the fine arts beginning teacher mentoring program, the equipment replacement and program-sharing property tax levy, and the posting of education-related job openings; and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1212.) Effective date: 06/01/2023, 07/01/2023. Applicability date: 01/24/2023, 07/01/2023.

IA SSB1212

A bill for an act relating to the funding of, the operation of, and appropriation of moneys to the department for the blind, the department of education, and the state board of regents, and providing for properly related matters.(See SF 560.)

IA SSB3201

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the education system, including the funding and operation of the department for the blind, department of education, and state board of regents, and including effective date provisions.(See SF 2435.)

IA SF2435

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the education system, including the funding and operation of the department for the blind, department of education, and state board of regents; modifying provisions related to compulsory education, open enrollment, the state board of regents presidential search committee, the Iowa tuition grants program, and the Iowa dyslexia board; establishing restrictions related to diversity, equity, and inclusion efforts of institutions of higher education governed by the state board of regents; providing penalties; and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3201.) Effective date: 05/09/2024, 07/01/2024, 07/01/2025. Applicability date: 07/01/2024.

IA SSB1231

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the education system, including the funding and operation of the department for the blind, department of education, and state board of regents, and including contingent effective date provisions.

IA SSB1222

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the education system, including the funding and operation of the department for the blind, department of education, and state board of regents.

IA HF2704

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the education system, including the funding and operation of the department for the blind, department of education, and state board of regents; modifying provisions related to compulsory education, open enrollment, the state board of regents presidential search committee, the Iowa tuition grants program, and the Iowa dyslexia board; establishing restrictions related to diversity, equity, and inclusion efforts of institutions of higher education governed by the state board of regents; providing penalties; and including effective date and applicability provisions.

IA HSB254

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the education system, including the funding and operation of the department for the blind, the department of education, and the state board of regents; requiring the state board of regents to conduct a study and prepare a report related to diversity, equity, and inclusion programs and efforts; providing for responsibilities of the workforce development board; establishing the Iowa workforce grant and incentive program; requiring the department of education to convene a task force on at-risk students and dropout prevention programs; modifying provisions related to the future ready Iowa skilled workforce grant program, the all Iowa opportunity scholarship program, the education savings account program, the gap tuition assistance program, the Iowa educational services for the blind and visually impaired program, career and technical education programs, the fine arts beginning teacher mentoring program, the equipment replacement and program-sharing property tax levy, and the posting of education-related job openings; and including effective date, applicability, and retroactive applicability provisions.(See HF 731.)