Iowa 2025-2026 Regular Session

Iowa House Bill HSB339

Introduced
4/30/25  

Caption

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, providing for properly related matters including indigent defense and representation, certain administrative procedures involving law enforcement officers, the corrections capital reinvestment fund, and a corrections federal receipts fund, and including effective date provisions.

Impact

This bill intends to improve the quality of legal representation for indigent defendants by increasing the compensation rates for court-appointed attorneys. Furthermore, it provides for the establishment of a federal receipts fund within the corrections department to manage and appropriate federal funds for programs and services. These reforms will likely enhance the operational capabilities of law enforcement agencies and other entities related to public defense, thus leading to improved justice system efficiency.

Summary

House Study Bill 339 aims to address various issues within the justice system of Iowa through appropriations and regulatory changes. The bill focuses on making significant financial allocations for the fiscal year 2025-2026 to the departments of justice, public safety, homeland security, and corrections. It also emphasizes the need for proper funding to ensure effective operation and management of legal services, public safety initiatives, and support for indigent defense.

Contention

Despite the apparent fiscal responsibility demonstrated through these appropriations, there are potential points of contention regarding how the funds are allocated and the specific areas of need they address. Critics may argue that certain services, particularly in mental health and rehabilitation for offenders, may require greater emphasis and funding that the bill does not sufficiently deliver. Additionally, the bill’s provisions regarding administrative procedures and the scrutiny surrounding law enforcement officer conduct may also lead to discussions about transparency and accountability in policing practices.

Companion Bills

IA SF644

Replaced by A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.(Formerly SSB 1232.)

IA SSB1232

Related A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.

Similar Bills

IA HF2693

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, and including effective date provisions. Effective date: 05/09/2024, 07/01/2024.

IA SSB3200

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.(See SF 2434.)

IA SF2434

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.(Formerly SSB 3200.)

IA SF562

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, including by providing for payments associated with indigent defense and representation, the funding of activities relating to consumer fraud and antitrust, a corrections capital reinvestment fund, an Iowa law enforcement academy study, a human trafficking study, and the funding of peace officer retirement, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1214.) Effective date: Enactment, 06/01/2023, 06/30/2023, 07/01/2023. Applicability date: 07/01/2022.

IA SSB1214

A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the justice system.(See SF 562.)

IA SSB3191

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.

IA SF644

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.(Formerly SSB 1232.)

IA SSB1232

A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system.(See SF 644.)