House | 02/28/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 647. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 21. Nays, 0. H.J. 434. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 434. | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2025 8:00AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Subcommittee: Shipley, Croken and Thomson, C. H.J. 107. | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 105. | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |