House | 02/13/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 420. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 10. Nays, 1. H.J. 310. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 310. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2025 2:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee: Collins, Konfrst and Wheeler. H.J. 116. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Introduced, referred to Higher Education. H.J. 113. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON HIGHER EDUCATION |