House | 02/17/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 437. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 7. Nays, 4. H.J. 310. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 310. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2025 2:30PM RM 19. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee: Collins, Hora and Jacoby. H.J. 117. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Introduced, referred to Higher Education. H.J. 113. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON HIGHER EDUCATION |