House | 02/24/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 575. | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 10. Nays, 1. H.J. 366. | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 366. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2025 3:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee: Shipley, Wilburn and Wills, J. H.J. 117. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Introduced, referred to Higher Education. H.J. 113. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON HIGHER EDUCATION |