House | 02/06/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 270. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 7. Nays, 3. Excused, 1. H.J. 269. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 269. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2025 12:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee: Hora, Collins and Kurth. H.J. 117. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Introduced, referred to Higher Education. H.J. 114. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON HIGHER EDUCATION |