House | 02/13/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 402. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 7. Nays, 4. H.J. 310. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 310. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2025 12:00PM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2025 4:00PM RM 304 (Cancelled). | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee: Wheeler, Holt and Kurth. H.J. 117. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Introduced, referred to Higher Education. H.J. 114. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON HIGHER EDUCATION |