House | 01/30/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 175. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 17. Nays, 0. H.J. 147. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 147. | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/17/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2025 12:30PM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Subcommittee: Ingels, Hayes and Levin. H.J. 60. | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. H.J. 60. | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |