House | 03/07/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 855. | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 7. Nays, 4. H.J. 443. | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 443. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Tabled until future meeting. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2025 12:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee: Collins, Hora and Kurth. H.J. 117. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Introduced, referred to Higher Education. H.J. 114. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON HIGHER EDUCATION |