House | 03/07/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 867. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 7. Nays, 3. Excused, 1. H.J. 530. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 530. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2025 3:30PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2025 12:00PM House Lounge 2 (Cancelled). | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee: Collins, Konfrst and Shipley. H.J. 117. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Introduced, referred to Higher Education. H.J. 115. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON HIGHER EDUCATION |