House | 02/13/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 401. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 7. Nays, 4. H.J. 310. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 310. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2025 8:00AM RM 102. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee: Holt, Collins and Wilburn. H.J. 117. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Introduced, referred to Higher Education. H.J. 115. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON HIGHER EDUCATION |