House | 02/10/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 302. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 15. Nays, 8. H.J. 267. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 267. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2025 12:30PM RM 102. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2025 3:00PM RM 102 (Cancelled). | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee: Thomson, C., Lawler and Zabner. H.J. 118. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 115. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |