House | 03/07/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 889. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 23. Nays, 0. H.J. 186. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 186. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2025 12:00PM RM 103. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Jones and Scheetz. H.J. 124. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 121. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |