House | 02/28/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 641. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 20. Nays, 0. Excused, 1. H.J. 435. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 435. | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2025 8:00AM RM 102. | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Subcommittee reassigned: Wengryn, Jones and McBurney. H.J. 179. | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2025 12:00PM House Lounge (Cancelled). | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Subcommittee: Graber, Golding and McBurney. H.J. 125. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Introduced, referred to Local Government. H.J. 122. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |