House | 02/28/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 653. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 23. Nays, 1. Excused, 1. H.J. 451. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 450. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2025 12:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Subcommittee: Sexton, Bloomingdale and Jacoby. H.J. 135. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 133. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |