Senate | 03/11/2025 | Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Dawson. S.J. 491. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 443. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Placed on calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 435. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2025 9:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Subcommittee: Webster, Knox, and Warme. S.J. 301. | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Introduced, referred to Commerce. S.J. 216. |