House
|
04/29/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 04/29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Immediate message. S.J. 908.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 908.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Senate concurred with S-3126. S.J. 908.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
Message from House.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Immediate message. H.J. 1033.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Passed House, yeas 92, nays 0. H.J. 1031.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Amendment H-1238 adopted, as amended. H.J. 1031.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Amendment H-1263 to amendment H-1238 adopted. H.J. 1031.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1030.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1251, yeas 30, nays 60. H.J. 1030.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-1251, ruled not germane. H.J. 1029.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Amendment H-1263 filed. H.J. 1013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment H-1251 filed. H.J. 04/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Amendment H-1238 filed. H.J. 950.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 04/10.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 884.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Committee vote: Yeas, 22. Nays, 1. H.J. 04/01.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 04/01.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends passage.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2025 8:30AM House Lounge 2.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Subcommittee: Henderson, Ehlert and Kniff McCulla. H.J. 03/27.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 753.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 03/19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Immediate message.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Amendment S-3031 filed, adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 258.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 253.
|
|
|