House | 03/31/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/31/2025 12:30PM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 03/28/2025 | Subcommittee: Lawler, Srinivas and Watkins. H.J. 03/28. | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 03/24. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Message from Senate. H.J. 03/24. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Immediate message. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Amendment S-3021 adopted. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Amendment S-3021 filed. S.J. 493. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 260. | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 253. |