House | 04/21/2025 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 04/21. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Message from Senate. H.J. 995. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Immediate message. S.J. 839. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 836. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 688. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 383. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Placed on calendar. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2025 11:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Subcommittee: Rowley, Pike, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 303. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 264. |