Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Message from House. S.J. 830.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2025
|
Message from House.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Immediate message. H.J. 04/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Passed House, yeas 81, nays 12. H.J. 04/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment H-1246, yeas 31, nays 61, filed, lost. H.J. 04/17.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment H-1246 filed. H.J. 04/17.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 663.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Immediate message. S.J. 551.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 37, nays 9. S.J. 550.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Amendment S-3008 adopted. S.J. 550.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Amendment S-3022 filed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Amendment S-3008 filed. S.J. 360.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 273.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 266.
|
|
|