Senate | 03/06/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 554. S.J. 436. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2025 11:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Subcommittee reassigned: Salmon, Campbell, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 356. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Subcommittee: Salmon, Campbell, and Celsi. S.J. 341. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Rereferred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 307. | ||
Senate | 02/17/2025 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 278. |