LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SF366
Action History
IA
Iowa Senate Bill SF366
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2025-2026 Regular Session
Iowa Senate Bill SF366
Action History
Senate
03/05/2025
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 518. S.J. 423.
Senate
03/03/2025
Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Senate
02/25/2025
Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2025 4:00PM Room 315.
Senate
02/24/2025
Subcommittee: Campbell, Pike, and Winckler. S.J. 342.
Senate
02/19/2025
Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 309.