House | 04/01/2025 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2025 8:30AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Subcommittee: Bossman, Cooling and Mommsen. H.J. 03/26. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 03/18. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Message from Senate. H.J. 680. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Immediate message. S.J. 562. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Passed Senate, yeas 36, nays 12. S.J. 560. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 318. | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 311. |