Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Message from House. S.J. 799.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Message from House.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Immediate message. H.J. 04/15.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Passed House, yeas 94, nays 0. H.J. 04/15.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 04/10.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 887.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Committee vote: Yeas, 21. Nays, 0. H.J. 04/01.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 04/01.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends passage.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/24/2025 12:30PM House Lounge 2.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Subcommittee: Mommsen, Hermanson and Kurth. H.J. 03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Read first time, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 615.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 609.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Immediate message. S.J. 490.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 489.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 360.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 352.
|
|
|