House
|
04/24/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends passage.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 04/24/2025 12:00PM House Lounge.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Subcommittee: Nordman, Baeth and Lundgren. H.J. 1035.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 04/01.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Committee vote: Yeas, 14. Nays, 7. H.J. 04/01.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 04/01.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/25/2025 8:15AM RM 304.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Subcommittee: Ingels, Baeth and Weldon. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Read first time, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 663.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Immediate message. S.J. 549.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 40, nays 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 383.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 380.
|
|
|