Senate | 04/21/2025 | Withdrawn. S.J. 839. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | HF 640 substituted. S.J. 838. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Amendment S-3045 adopted. S.J. 838. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 689. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Amendment S-3045 filed. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Attached to HF 640. S.J. 554. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 383. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 381. |