House
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 04/10.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 885.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Committee vote: Yeas, 14. Nays, 6. Excused, 1. H.J. 885.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 885.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends passage.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2025 12:30PM RM 102.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Subcommittee: Thomson, C., Lawler and Olson. H.J. 03/28.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 03/26.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 589.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Immediate message. S.J. 454.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 15. S.J. 452.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 386.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 381.
|
|
|