Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 638. S.J. 860. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2025 3:30PM Senate Lounge. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Subcommittee reassigned: Klimesh, Dawson, and Quirmbach. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Dawson, and Petersen. S.J. 491. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 398. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 395. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 390. |