House
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 04/10.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 03/20.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Committee vote: Yeas, 19. Nays, 0. Excused, 2. H.J. 03/20.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 03/20.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends passage.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2025 12:00PM RM 102.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2025
|
Subcommittee: Holt, Lawler and Olson. H.J. 657.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 03/12.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 592.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Immediate message. S.J. 456.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 14. S.J. 455.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Amendment S-3020 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 455.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 424.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2025
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 416.
|
|
|