House | 04/10/2025 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 04/10. | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee amendment H-1218 filed. H.J. 903. | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Placed on calendar. H.J. 902. | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee Vote: Yeas, 20. Nays, 0. Excused, 1. H.J. 902. | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 902. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2025 8:15AM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Subcommittee: Holt, Wessel-Kroeschell and Wheeler. H.J. 03/25. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 03/18. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Message from Senate. H.J. 680. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Immediate message. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Passed Senate, yeas 35, nays 13. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 425. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 417. |