House
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 04/10.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 883.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Committee vote: Yeas, 19. Nays, 0. Excused, 3. H.J. 883.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 883.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends passage.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2025 12:30PM RM 304.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Subcommittee: Wills, J., Nordman and Zabner. H.J. 03/27.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 03/26.
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 810.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Immediate message. S.J. 637.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 1. S.J. 637.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Amendment S-3052 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 636.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Amendment S-3053 filed, adopted. S.J. 636.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Deferred. S.J. 629.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 468.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 460.
|
|
|