House
|
04/29/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 1076.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Immediate message. S.J. 913.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 911.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2025
|
Senate concurred with S-3121. S.J. 911.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2025
|
Message from House.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Immediate message. H.J. 1010.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Passed House, yeas 91, nays 0. H.J. 1008.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2025
|
Amendment H-1255 adopted. H.J. 1008.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Amendment H-1255 filed. H.J. 993.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 928.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Placed on calendar. H.J. 04/01.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Committee vote: Yeas, 21. Nays, 0. Excused, 2. H.J. 04/01.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2025
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 04/01.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends passage.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2025 8:00AM RM 304.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2025
|
Subcommittee: Lawler, Blom and Wilson. H.J. 03/24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 03/19.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 03/19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Immediate message. S.J. 581.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 580.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 468.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 460.
|
|
|