House | 04/10/2025 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 04/10. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Placed on calendar. H.J. 04/01. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 19. Nays, 1. Excused, 1. H.J. 04/01. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 04/01. | ||
House | 04/01/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2025 8:15AM RM 102. | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Subcommittee: Jones, Bloomingdale and Wichtendahl. H.J. 874. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Read first time, referred to Local Government. H.J. 03/26. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Message from Senate. H.J. 818. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Immediate message. S.J. 652. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Passed Senate, yeas 43, nays 4. S.J. 652. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 474. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 461. |