Senate | 04/08/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 620. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2025 1:00PM Room 315. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Subcommittee reassigned: Klimesh, Rowley, and Townsend. S.J. 567. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Petersen, and Rowley. S.J. 552. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 480. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 472. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 462. |