House | 04/01/2025 | Tabled until future meeting. | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2025 12:00PM RM 304. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Subcommittee: Wills, J., Bagniewski and Lundgren. H.J. 03/27. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 03/24. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Message from Senate. H.J. 03/24. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Immediate message. S.J. 619. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 618. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 479. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 463. |