Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as []. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/16/2025 11:00AM Senate Lounge. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Subcommittee: Costello, Donahue, and Warme. S.J. 801. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 757. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 736. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 735. |