House | 04/30/2025 | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 04/30. | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1076. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Immediate message. | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 859. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 857. |