Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Signed by Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Message from House.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Immediate message. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Passed House, yeas 65, nays 33. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 685.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1108, yeas 33, nays 65. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-1108, ruled not germane. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1107, yeas 33, nays 65. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-1107, ruled not germane. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Substituted for HF 786. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 03/18.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Amendment H-1108 filed. H.J. 677.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Amendment H-1107 filed. H.J. 677.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 594.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 589.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Immediate message. S.J. 448.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 35, nays 12. S.J. 445.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Amendment S-3018 filed, adopted. S.J. 445.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 127.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 118.
|
|
|