Iowa 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Iowa Senate Bill SF75 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/10/2025

                    Senate File 75 - Reprinted   SENATE FILE 75   BY COMMITTEE ON LOCAL   GOVERNMENT   (SUCCESSOR TO SSB 1018)   (As Amended and Passed by the Senate March 10, 2025 )   A BILL FOR   An Act relating to county supervisors, concerning county 1   supervisor representation plans and county supervisor 2   vacancies, and including effective date provisions. 3   BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF IOWA: 4   SF 75 (2) 91   th/ns/mb  

  S.F. 75   DIVISION I 1   PLAN THREE COUNTY SUPERVISOR REPRESENTATION PLANS AND SPECIAL 2   ELECTIONS 3   Section 1. Section 331.206, subsection 2, paragraph a, Code 4   2025, is amended to read as follows: 5   a. The plan used under subsection 1 shall be selected by the 6   board or by a special election as provided in section 331.207 . 7   A plan selected by the board shall remain in effect for at 8   least six years and shall only be changed by a special election 9   as provided in section 331.207. However, a county with the   10   main campus of an institution of higher learning governed by   11   the state board of regents shall use plan three for the 12   election of supervisors. 13   Sec. 2. Section 331.207, subsections 2, 5, and 6, Code 2025, 14   are amended to read as follows: 15   2. The petition shall be filed with the county commissioner 16   by June 1 of an odd-numbered year, subject to subsection 6   7 . 17   The special election shall be held on the first Tuesday after   18   the first Monday   in August November of the odd-numbered year. 19   Notice of the special election shall be published once each 20   week for three successive weeks in an official newspaper of the 21   county, shall state the representation plans to be submitted to 22   the electors, and shall state the date of the special election. 23   The last in the series of publications shall occur not less 24   than four nor more than twenty days before the election. 25   5. If the plan adopted by a plurality of the ballots cast 26   in the special election represents a change from plan one to 27   plan two or three, or from plan two to plan three, as 28   each plan is defined in section 331.206 , the temporary county 29   redistricting commission shall divide the county into districts 30   as provided in sections 331.209 and 331.210 . The plan shall 31   be completed not later than November 1   December 31 following 32   the special election and shall be submitted to the state 33   commissioner of elections. The plan shall become effective the 34   following January 1. 35   -1-   SF 75 (2) 91   th/ns/mb 1/ 4              

  S.F. 75   6. Notwithstanding any provision of this section to the 1   contrary, a county with a population of sixty thousand or 2   more based on the most recent federal decennial census that 3   elects supervisors under plan three shall not change from 4   plan three to plan one or plan two pursuant to a special 5   election under this section unless a plan one or plan two 6   representation plan is adopted by a two-thirds vote of the 7   ballots cast in the special election. This subsection does not   8   apply to a county with the main campus of an institution of   9   higher learning governed by the state board of regents required 10   to use plan three under section 331.206, subsection 2.   11   Sec. 3. TRANSITION PROVISION. 12   1. Notwithstanding any provision of law to the contrary, 13   a county with the main campus of an institution of higher 14   learning governed by the state board of regents that does not 15   use plan three for the election of supervisors, as defined in 16   section 331.206, as of the effective date of this Act, shall 17   elect supervisors using plan three during the 2026 general 18   election, using a representation plan drawn pursuant to section 19   331.210A, subsection 2, paragraph f, and the requirements of 20   this section. 21   2. A county required to use a representation plan as 22   provided in this section shall establish a temporary county 23   redistricting commission by the later of thirty days after the 24   effective date of this Act or May 15, 2025, and shall complete 25   a precinct plan, in conformity with the requirements of 26   sections 331.209 and 331.210A, no later than October 1, 2025.   27   The precinct plan shall be submitted to the state commissioner 28   of elections and the legislative services agency shall draw and 29   publish the representation plan by January 1, 2026. 30   DIVISION II   31   COUNTY SUPERVISOR VACANCIES   32   Sec. 4. Section 43.6, subsection 2, Code 2025, is amended   33   to read as follows: 34   2. When a vacancy occurs in the office of county supervisor 35   -2-   SF 75 (2) 91   th/ns/mb 2/ 4      

  S.F. 75   or any of the offices listed in section 39.17 and more than 1   seventy days remain in the term of office following the next 2   general election, the office shall be filled for the balance 3   of the unexpired term at that general election unless the 4   vacancy has been filled by a special election called more 5   than seventy-three days before the primary election. If 6   the vacancy occurs more than seventy-three days before the 7   primary election, political party candidates for that office 8   at the next general election shall be nominated at the primary 9   election. If an appointment to fill the vacancy in office is 10   made in accordance with section 69.14A, subsection 1, paragraph   11   a , eighty-eight or more days before the primary election and 12   a petition requesting a special election has not been received 13   within fourteen days after the appointment is made, candidates 14   for the office shall be nominated at the primary election. 15   Sec. 5. Section 69.14A, subsection 1, paragraph a, 16   unnumbered paragraph 1, Code 2025, is amended to read as 17   follows: 18   By   If the population of the county is less than one hundred 19   twenty-five thousand based on the most recent federal decennial 20   census and if the county does not include the main campus of   21   an institution of higher learning governed by the state board 22   of regents, by   appointment by the committee of county officers 23   designated to fill the vacancy in section 69.8 . 24   Sec. 6. Section 69.14A, subsection 1, paragraph b, 25   unnumbered paragraph 1, Code 2025, is amended to read as 26   follows:   27   By   If the population of the county is one hundred 28   twenty-five thousand or more based on the most recent federal 29   decennial census or the county includes the main campus of an   30   institution of higher learning governed by the state board of 31   regents, by   special election held to fill the office for the 32   remaining balance of the unexpired term. 33   Sec. 7. Section 331.201, subsection 3, Code 2025, is amended 34   to read as follows: 35   -3-   SF 75 (2) 91   th/ns/mb 3/ 4                 

  S.F. 75   3. The office of supervisor is an elective office except 1   that if a vacancy occurs on the board, a successor may be 2   appointed to the unexpired term as provided in section 69.14A ,   3   subsection 1, paragraph a , if the population of the county is 4   less than one hundred twenty-five thousand based on the most   5   recent federal decennial census and if the county does not   6   include the main campus of an institution of higher learning 7   governed by the state board of regents . 8   Sec. 8. Section 331.214, subsection 2, paragraph c, Code 9   2025, is amended to read as follows: 10   c. If the board declares a vacancy under this subsection and 11   the remaining balance of the supervisors unexpired term is two 12   and one-half years or more, a special election shall be held to 13   fill the office as provided in section 69.14A, subsection 1 , 14   paragraph c , if the population of the county is one hundred   15   twenty-five thousand or more based on the most recent federal 16   decennial census or the county includes the main campus of an 17   institution of higher learning governed by the state board of   18   regents   . However, if the population of the county is less 19   than one hundred twenty-five thousand based on the most recent 20   federal decennial census and if the county does not include the   21   main campus of an institution of higher learning governed by 22   the state board of regents, an appointment shall be made to   23   fill the office as provided in section 69.14A, subsection 1, 24   paragraph a . 25   DIVISION III 26   EFFECTIVE DATE   27   Sec. 9. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act, being deemed of immediate 28   importance, takes effect upon enactment. 29   -4-   SF 75 (2) 91   th/ns/mb 4/ 4