LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SJR2
Action History
IA
Iowa Senate Bill SJR2
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2025-2026 Regular Session
Iowa Senate Bill SJR2
Action History
Senate
01/30/2025
Subcommittee recommends passage.
Senate
01/28/2025
Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2025 2:45PM Room G15.
Senate
01/27/2025
Subcommittee: Schultz, Blake, and Rozenboom. S.J. 142.
Senate
01/23/2025
Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 129.