Senate | 04/29/2025 | Sent to Secretary of State. S.J. 929. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Message from House. S.J. 831. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Message from House. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 985. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Passed House, yeas 87, nays 6. H.J. 04/17. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Substituted for HJR 9. H.J. 04/17. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 894. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 03/19. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Message from Senate. H.J. 03/19. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Immediate message. S.J. 582. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 582. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 384. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 378. |