LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SSB1041
Action History
IA
Iowa Senate Bill SSB1041
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2025-2026 Regular Session
Iowa Senate Bill SSB1041
Action History
Senate
02/24/2025
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 426.
Senate
01/29/2025
Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Senate
01/28/2025
Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2025 3:15PM Room 217 Conference Room.
Senate
01/27/2025
Subcommittee: Sweeney, Bennett, and Shipley.
Senate
01/23/2025
Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment.
Senate
01/23/2025
By COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES AND ENVIRONMENT